This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 07/12/2022 at 17:29:05 (UTC).

Barron County vs. Jamie R Hielkema

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 Barron County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Jamie R Hielkema. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Bitney, J. M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0213

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Bitney, J. M

 

Party Details

Defendant

Hielkema, Jamie R

New Auburn, WI 54757

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wright, Brian H., Aty

Seidlitz, Brady James

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Court trial; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.; Location: JMB Check Monitor & Posted Calendar for Courtroom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on July 25, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on July 18, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond posted; Amount: $150.0; Additional Text: 22R 004147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Bond document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Actual bond posted with sheriff; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.; Court Reporter: Ostenson, Alison; Additional Text: 1:29 PM Prosecuting attorney Brady James Seidlitz in court for the State of Wisconsin. Defendant Jamie R Hielkema appeared by video. Count #1: Defendant pleads not guilty. Court trial set; must appear in person. Court trial scheduled for July 18, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.; Court Reporter: Ostenson, Alison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Not guilty plea; Court Official: Bitney, J. M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.01; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Charge Modifiers; Statute: 968.075(1)(a); Description: Domestic Abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seidlitz, Brady James