This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 08/22/2022 at 16:13:03 (UTC).

Barron County vs. Chase A McCarty

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Barron County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Chase A McCarty. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Boyle, Maureen D and Millermon, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0351

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Boyle, Maureen D

Millermon, Sharon

 

Party Details

Defendant

McCarty, Chase A

Barron, WI 54812

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wright, Brian H., Aty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $300.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $150.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $150.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Cash bond applied; Amount: $150.0; Additional Text: 22A 051459

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of conviction; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Actual bond posted with sheriff; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D; Court Reporter: Ebner, Jessica; Additional Text: 1:13 PM Prosecuting attorney Brian H. Wright Aty in court for the State of Wisconsin. Defendant Chase A McCarty in court. 1:13 Court relates and gives appearances. Address and phone number confirmed. Defendant pleads no contest; Court finds defendant guilty. $200.50 plus Domestic Abuse surcharge for total of $300.50; 60 days to pay. $150 cash posted to apply.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.01; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2022-08-08; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2022-08-08; Ordered Date: 2022-08-08; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Boyle, Maureen D; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: $150.00 cash bond to be applied. Balance of $150.50 remains due. Financial obligations are due within 60 days of the sentence date. The Barron County Clerk of Courts shall collect all financial obligations. In the event of non-payment of outstanding financial obligations, a civil judgment shall be entered against the defendant and in favor of restitution victims and governmental entities for the balance due. All available enforcement actions will be used to collect all debt.; Charge Modifiers; Statute: 968.075(1)(a); Description: Domestic Abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wright, Brian H., Aty