This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 15:09:55 (UTC).

Barron County vs. Andrew H Langevin

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Barron County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Andrew H Langevin. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Boyle, Maureen D and Millermon, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0371

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Boyle, Maureen D

Millermon, Sharon

 

Party Details

Defendant

Langevin, Andrew H

Eleva, WI 54738

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Wright, Brian H., Aty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Returned Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BARRON; Case number: 2021FO000371; Caption: Barron County vs. Andrew H Langevin; Total Amount: $200.5; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Andrew H Langevin; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 342, Eleva, WI 54738; Judgment Party; Party Name: Barron County Clerk of Circuit Court; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $200.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judgment for unpaid fine/forfeiture/other; Amount: $200.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $200.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $0.0; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $200.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Returned Notice of Intent to Certify Debt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of conviction; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Langevin, Andrew H; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Andrew H Langevin Current: PO Box 342, Eleva, WI 54738 United States (Effective: 07-19-2021) Prior: 605 W Main St, Cameron, WI 54822

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D; Court Reporter: Malsom, Kathy A; Additional Text: 01:47 PM Defendant Andrew H Langevin (zoom video) in court, in custody. Brian H. Wright appeared for the Barron County. Defendant pleads NC; Court finds defendant guilty. $200.50 forfeiture; 60 days to pay. (MS scanned to jail)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D; Court Reporter: Malsom, Kathy A; Additional Text: by zoom video

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D; Court Reporter: Malsom, Kathy A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Boyle, Maureen D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.01; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Plea: No Contest on 2021-07-19; Description: Disorderly Conduct; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-07-19; Ordered Date: 2021-07-19; Action: Guilty Due to No Contest Plea; Court official: Boyle, Maureen D; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: Financial obligations are due within 60 days of the sentence date. The Barron County Clerk of Courts shall collect all financial obligations. In the event of non-payment of outstanding financial obligations, a civil judgment shall be entered against the defendant and in favor of restitution victims and governmental entities for the balance due. All available enforcement actions will be used to collect all debt.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wright, Brian H., Aty