This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 02/23/2022 at 12:16:01 (UTC).

Barron County vs. Alexia J Mortenson

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Barron County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Alexia J Mortenson. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Babler, James C and Millermon, Sharon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0346

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Babler, James C

Millermon, Sharon

 

Party Details

Defendant

Mortenson, Alexia J

Comstock, WI 54826

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Matucheski, Julie L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment of conviction; Court Official: Millermon, Sharon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Intake; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura; Additional Text: 10:21 AM Defendant Alexia J Mortenson in court. Brian H. Wright appeared for the Barron County. Alexia J Mortenson appeared by video means. DE pleads guilty. Court accepts plea, finds guilty, and orders $200.50 forfeiture with 60 days to pay.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dispositional order/judgment; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Intake on August 4, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialCourt Assessments: $200.5; Adjustments: $0.0; Paid to the court: $200.5; Probation/other agency amount: $0.0; Balance due to court: $0.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Complaint filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons; Additional Text: Hearing set for 8/4/2021 at 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Actual bond posted with sheriff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 9.16; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Plea: Guilty on 2021-08-04; Description: Obstructing an Officer; Sentences; Sentence Date: 2021-08-04; Ordered Date: 2021-08-04; Action: Guilty Due to Guilty Plea; Court official: Babler, James C.; Sentence Details; Sentence: Forfeiture / Fine; Notes: Financial obligations are due within 60 days of the sentence date. The Barron County Clerk of Courts shall collect all financial obligations. In the event of non-payment of outstanding financial obligations, a civil judgment shall be entered against the defendant and in favor of restitution victims and governmental entities for the balance due. All available enforcement actions will be used to collect all debt.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matucheski, Julie L