This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 12/30/2022 at 17:14:33 (UTC).

Ashland County vs. Kaitlin M Sweet

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Ashland County filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Kaitlin M Sweet. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Kelly J. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0283

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Kelly J

 

Party Details

Defendant

Sweet, Kaitlin M

Drummond, WI 54832

Not Yet Classified

District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Intake; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Location: Ashland County Courthouse - Room 303; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketBond mount: $263.5; Deposit Type: None; Mandatory: No; Plate Number: 923XYS; Expiration: 2023; VIN: 1HGES25803L037709; Issuing Agency: Ashland County Sheriff; Officer Name: Leask, Adam; Violation Date: 2022-11-27; Plaintiff Agency: Ashland County; Ordinance or Statute: Statute; Statute: 961.41(3g)(e); Charge Description: Possession of THC (Ordinance Violation); Severity: Forf. U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Citation filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2022
  • ChargeCount No: 1; Severity: Forf. U; Statute cite: 961.41(3g)(e); Description: Possession of THC (Ordinance Violation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less