This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 01/11/2023 at 10:25:54 (UTC).

Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc. vs. Madison Metropolitan School District

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 Wisconsin Institute for Law Liberty, Inc filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Madison Metropolitan School District. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Lanford, Rhonda L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1216

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Lanford, Rhonda L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc.

Respondent

Madison Metropolitan School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Esenberg, Richard Michael

Brewer, Cory J

Spitz, Katherine D.

Berg, Luke N.

Respondent Attorneys

Zylstra, Sarah A.

Horner, Sarah J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Lanford, Rhonda L.; Additional Text: with prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial; Court Official: Lanford, Rhonda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: joint stipulation for dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty Zylstra in RE - Parties are working on stipulation; RE does not intend to file brief due on September 9, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Oral arguments on November 21, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Lanford, Rhonda L.; Court Reporter: Leigh, Lee; Additional Text: 10:48 AM Attorney Sarah A. Zylstra appeared by video for Madison Metropolitan School District. Attorney Luke N. Berg appeared by video for Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty, Inc. Update by Atty Berg. Response by Atty Zylstra. The Court set a briefing schedule. The first brief is due 9-9-2022. Response due 10-10-2022. Reply due 11-4-2022. Oral argument set. Oral arguments scheduled for November 21, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Response/Answer to Petitioner's Application for Alternative Writ of Mandamus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Return/Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on August 4, 2022 at 11:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Atty Zylstra accepted service on behalf of MMD: summons and petition for Writ of Mandamus on 6-8-2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and petition; Additional Text: for Writ of Mandamus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 023762, Payable Number: 564176, Receipt Number: 22RS022364, Amount: $184.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Application for Alternative Writ of Mandamus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Affidavit of Luke Berg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less