This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 18:12:16 (UTC).

Wisconsin Ethics Commission vs. Carrie Pitt et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Wisconsin Ethics Commission filed an Other lawsuit against Carrie Pitt. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Sloma, Katherine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0010

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Sloma, Katherine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wisconsin Ethics Commission

Madison, WI 53707

Defendants

Pitt, Carrie

Bonduel, WI 54107

Democratic Party of Shawano County

137 N. 1St St.

Bonduel, WI 54107

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buerger, David

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $8.75; Additional Text: 23R 000734 - Gov Pay copies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Sloma, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Request to Dismiss Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: Proposed Dismissal Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Sloma, Katherine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 001716, Payable Number: 187243, Receipt Number: 23R 000460, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less