This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 03/07/2023 at 18:02:20 (UTC).

Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB vs. Shari A Pharr et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2023 Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Shari A Pharr. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Yang-47, Kristy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0131

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Yang-47, Kristy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendants

Pharr, Shari A

Milwaukee, WI 53216

Unknown Spouse of Shari A Pharr

Milwaukee, WI 53216

Artisan And Truckers Casualty Company

Mayfield Heights, OH 44124

Midland Funding LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company, 8040 Excelsior Drive

Madison, WI 53717

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

120 Corporate Boulevard, Suite 100

Norfolk, VA 23502

Neighborhood Improvement Development Corporation

Milwaukee, WI 53202

US Bank National Association

Owensboro, KY 42301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schmeling, Sara Marie

Defendant Attorneys

Helsel, Tyler M

Major, James D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 008209, Payable Number: 1059210, Receipt Number: 23RP003659, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Yang-47, Kristy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $289.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 001998, Payable Number: 1054954, Receipt Number: 23RP000944, Amount: $289.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less