This case was last updated from Shawano County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 18:39:03 (UTC).

UHG I LLC vs. Maryssa Smith

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 UHG I LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Maryssa Smith. This case was filed in Shawano County Courts, Shawano County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kussel, William F., Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0290

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Shawano, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kussel, William F., Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UHG I LLC

6400 Sheridan Drive, Suite 138

Buffalo, NY 14221

Defendant

Smith, Maryssa

Shawano, WI 54166

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schaefer, Emma N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: sent to Maryssa Smith / Notice of entry of judgment and financial disclosure.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 014480, Payable Number: 183537, Receipt Number: 22R 007799, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHAWANO; Case number: 2022SC000290; Caption: UHG I LLC vs. Maryssa Smith; Total Amount: $2223.82; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: UHG I LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6400 Sheridan Drive, Suite 138, Buffalo, NY 14221 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Maryssa Smith; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 617 E SCHURZ ST, Shawano, WI 54166; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $4.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1950.32; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.; Court Reporter: Gutierrez, Alexis; Additional Text: 1:37 PM Defendant Maryssa Smith not in court. Attorney Emma N. Schaefer not in court, appearance not required. Judgment granted in the amount of $1950.32 plus applicable costs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 012425, Payable Number: 182887, Receipt Number: 22R 006778, Amount: $2.00 Amount requested on Summons and Complaint=$1,950.32 **AMENDED DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Smith, Maryssa; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Maryssa Smith Current: 617 E SCHURZ ST, Shawano, WI 54166 (Effective: 06-30-2022) Prior: 904 S PARK ST, Shawano, WI 54166 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims return date procedures

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: sent to Maryssa Smith /Small claims summons and complaint/ Notified plaintiff by EFILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Kussel, William F., Jr.; Additional Text: Amount requested on Summons and Complaint=$1950.32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 012081, Payable Number: 182632, Receipt Number: 22R 006373, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims return date procedures

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less