This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 09/27/2022 at 18:07:38 (UTC).

Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-4 vs. James W. Uttech et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-4 filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against James W Uttech. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabriele, Angelina and Wilk, David. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0782

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gabriele, Angelina

Wilk, David

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2019-4

3217 S. Decker Lake Dr., C/O Select Portfolio Servicing

Defendants

Uttech, James W.

Uttech, Lynette S.

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

100 Shockoe Slip Fl 2, C/O Corporation Service Co.

State of Wisconsin

114 East State Capitol, C/O Attorney General

The United States of America

950 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Rm B-103, C/O Us Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foshag, William Nicholas

Defendant Attorney

McNeilly, James W., Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Wilk, David; Additional Text: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be and the same is hereby dismissed without prejudice and the lis pendens filed in the office of the Register of Deeds for this county be and the same is hereby discharged from the record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Wilk, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover Letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Court Official: Wilk, David; Additional Text: Petition for Dismissal - filed by Atty William Foshag

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Court Official: Wilk, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: filed by Atty James McNeilly Jr. on behalf of State of WI, dept of Rev.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Wilk, David; Additional Text: judicial rotation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of assignment of judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Gabriele, Angelina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 357556, Payable Number: 346439, Receipt Number: 22R 021687, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Note, Mortgage, Loan Modification and Lien Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNeilly, James W., Jr.