This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 01/13/2023 at 01:05:50 (UTC).

Tidewater Finance Company t/a Tidewater Motor Credit vs. Max Hawkins et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Tidewater Finance Company t/a Tidewater Motor Credit filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Max Hawkins. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenitz, Michael S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0615

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kenitz, Michael S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tidewater Finance Company t/a Tidewater Motor Credit

6520 Indian River Road

Virginia Beach, VA 23464

Defendants

Hawkins, Max

Marshfield, WI 54449

Hawkins, Brooke

Marshfield, WI 54449

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Conlin, Alex B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: 12/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $85.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Max Hawkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $85.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Brooke Hawkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: filed by Atty A Conlin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Hawkins, Max; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Max Hawkins Current: 1209 E 29TH ST, Marshfield, WI 54449 (Effective: 12-15-2022) Prior: 624 LINDEN AVE, Hartford, WI 53027

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Hawkins, Brooke; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Brooke Hawkins Current: 1209 E 29TH ST, Marshfield, WI 54449 (Effective: 12-15-2022) Prior: 624 LINDEN AVE, Hartford, WI 53027

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $70.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint and Exhibits on Brooke Hawkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $70.0; Additional Text: of Summons and Complaint for Max Hawkins at 624 Linden Ave

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $70.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Max Hawkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $70.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Brooke Hawkins

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: filed by Atty A. Conlin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Hawkins, Max; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Max Hawkins Current: 624 LINDEN AVE, Hartford, WI 53027 (Effective: 12-07-2022) Prior: 1551 Woodruff Way, Hartford, WI 53027 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Hawkins, Brooke; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Brooke Hawkins Current: 624 LINDEN AVE, Hartford, WI 53027 (Effective: 12-07-2022) Prior: 1551 Woodruff Way, Hartford, WI 53027 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: filed by Atty Alex Conlin/Keith D Weiner & Assoc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 214569, Payable Number: 172449, Receipt Number: 22R 022597, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Conlin, Alex B