This case was last updated from Green Lake County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 12:55:05 (UTC).

Thunderbird Bakery vs. Avrom Farm

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 Thunderbird Bakery filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Avrom Farm. This case was filed in Green Lake County Courts, Green Lake County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Slate, Mark T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0227

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Green Lake, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Slate, Mark T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thunderbird Bakery

Oshkosh, WI 54904

Defendant

Avrom Farm

Ripon, WI 54971

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Slate, Mark T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Slate, Mark T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letter of dismissal; Additional Text: to Court from plaintiff dated December 5, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: (Summons/Complaint served on Hayden Robert Holbert by substitute service on his father, John Holbert, on November 24, 2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 22R 004698

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Small Claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less