This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 01/12/2023 at 01:07:05 (UTC).

Thomas L. Viken vs. Greywolf Acquisitions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Thomas L Viken filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Greywolf Acquisitions, LLC. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Lanford, Rhonda L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1919

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Lanford, Rhonda L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Viken, Thomas L.

Defendants

Greywolf Acquisitions, LLC

Scarlet Badger, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Starkweather, John P

Horner, Sarah J.

Defendant Attorneys

Fulton, Bradley C.

Rohlfing, Jordan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Horner for PL - Thomas L. Viken. Atty Tirella withdraws as counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: to Greywolf Counterclaims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 045460, Payable Number: 576001, Receipt Number: 22RS040704, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Rohlfing for Greywolf Acquisitions LLC and Scarlet Badger LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 045463, Payable Number: 575990, Receipt Number: 22RS040691, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Fulton for DEs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: copy of Summons & Complaint on Reganne Cutsforth, authorized receiver for Greywolf Acquisitions, LLC on August 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: copy of Summons & Complaint on Reganne Cutsforth, authorized reciever, for Scarlet Badger, LLC on August 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 038564, Payable Number: 571043, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less