This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:41:49 (UTC).

Synchrony Bank vs. ROBERT B KARGBO

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Synchrony Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERT B KARGBO. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Fremgen, Mark R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0308

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Fremgen, Mark R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Synchrony Bank

Defendant

KARGBO, ROBERT B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Fremgen, Mark R.; Location: Via Zoom Video/Phone; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on March 15, 2023 at 08:20 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Change of Hearing; Additional Text: Instructions for how to appear remotely for 3/15 pre-trial conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: of defn contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Additional Text: Schedule 10 minute pre-trial conference.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: $60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 001905, Payable Number: 588562, Receipt Number: 23RS002139, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less