This case was last updated from Vernon County Courts on 01/13/2023 at 02:23:00 (UTC).

Royal Bank vs. The Estate of Mary A. Sinkus et al

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 Royal Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against The Estate of Mary A Sinkus. This case was filed in Vernon County Courts, Vernon County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Rood, Darcy J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0126

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Vernon, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Rood, Darcy J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Royal Bank

P.O. Box 116, 731 Water Avenue

Hillsboro, WI 54634

Defendants

The Estate of Mary A. Sinkus

225 Main Street Suite 1, C/O Attorney Gene A. Cisewski

Elroy, WI 53929-1251

City of Hillsboro, Wisconsin

P.O. Box 447, 123 Mechanic Street

Hillsboro, WI 54634

Couleecap, Inc.

201 Melby Street

Westby, WI 54667

La Crosse County

212 6Th Street North

La Crosse, WI 54601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Casey, Thomas J.

Defendant Attorneys

Cisewski, Gene A

Homar, Timothy

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 010219, Payable Number: 64395, Receipt Number: 22R 003503, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 010208, Payable Number: 64380, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 009470, Payable Number: 64336, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less