This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 12:31:05 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. SAJIDAH J DARR

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAJIDAH J DARR. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are SCC3 and Liggins, Alexis R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9218

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

SCC3

Liggins, Alexis R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Po Box 12914

Defendant

DARR, SAJIDAH J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Liggins, Alexis R.; Additional Text: This hearing was held via Zoom due to COVID-19. Attorney Kayla A Paleka appeared by video for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Defendant SAJIDAH J DARR not in court. Action dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned for further proceedings on September 15, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Liggins, Alexis R.; Additional Text: This hearing was held via Zoom due to COVID-19. Attorney Kayla A Paleka appeared by video means for Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Defendant SAJIDAH J DARR not in court. Adjourned for further proceedings scheduled for September 15, 2022 at 08:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: Defendant do not live at address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on August 11, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $3475.94; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 069960, Payable Number: 1021761, Receipt Number: 22RP029838, Amount: $118.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A