This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:41:58 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. MEGAN J SMITH

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEGAN J SMITH. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0306

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

SMITH, MEGAN J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Adjourned return date; Court Official: 2675 Commissioner, Small Claims; Location: 1st Floor, Room 1000; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Court Official: 2675 Commissioner, Small Claims; Additional Text: w/ADJRD 3-17-23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Additional Text: RD 2-10-23 to REV 4-13-23 No Affidavit of Service (AFS) or other sufficient evidence of service filed by return date. If such affidavit is not filed by review date, case will be dismissed and plaintiff will be required to file a motion to reopen if service has been accomplished. If service has not been accomplished by review date, plaintiff will be required to file a new case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEvent: Attempted service; Additional Text: $60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 001900, Payable Number: 588560, Receipt Number: 23RS002136, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less