This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:43:41 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. MARISSA BEBEAU

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARISSA BEBEAU. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Brown, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Resar, Chad. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0205

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Resar, Chad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

BEBEAU, MARISSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • HearingDescription: Hearing; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Location: Commissioners Courtroom D, 1st Floor, Room 140; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Hearing on May 8, 2023 at 10:30 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: 2:13 PM Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC in court. Attorney Kayla A Paleka in court for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Defendant MARISSA BEBEAU in court. Hearing scheduled for May 8, 2023 at 10:30 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on March 1, 2023 at 02:15 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: 2:46 PM Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC in court. Attorney Kayla A Paleka in court for PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. Defendant MARISSA BEBEAU in court. Adjourned return date scheduled for March 1, 2023 at 02:15 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: to Plaintiff's Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Answer and Affirmative Defense mailed to Rausch Sturm LLP on 1/24/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 001359, Payable Number: 367347, Receipt Number: 23R 002063, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less