This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 22:44:11 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. Lisa Hines

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lisa Hines. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A and Christensen, Samuel A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1485

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A

Christensen, Samuel A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Po Box 12914

Norfolk, VA 23541

Defendant

HINES, LISA

Waterford, WI 53185-1522

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Location: Parties will participate via Zoom Video or Teleconference.; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on July 7, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $2505.23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 410376, Payable Number: 458365, Receipt Number: 22R 005747F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Account statement

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A