This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 08/13/2022 at 13:08:01 (UTC).

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC vs. David Cole

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against David Cole. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Fredrickson, Jon E and Christensen, Samuel A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1486

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Fredrickson, Jon E

Christensen, Samuel A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Po Box 12914

Defendant

COLE, DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: 2:04 PM Defendant David Cole not in court. Attorney Kayla A Paleka appeared by video for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. Dismissed by attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on July 7, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $1326.3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 410377, Payable Number: 458366, Receipt Number: 22R 005748F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Account statement

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paleka, Kayla A