This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:42:01 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. ANTHONY A BLUEL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY A BLUEL. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are McAndrew, W. Scott and Esqueda, Carlo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0305

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

McAndrew, W. Scott

Esqueda, Carlo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

BLUEL, ANTHONY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paleka, Kayla A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Esqueda, Carlo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: McAndrew, W. Scott

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DANE; Case number: 2023SC000305; Caption: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC vs. ANTHONY A BLUEL; Total Amount: $3401.97; Judgment Party; Party Name: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO BOX 12914, Norfolk, VA 23541 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: ANTHONY A BLUEL; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3324 Milwaukee St Apt 9, Madison, WI 53714-1855 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3077.47; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $60.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Default Judgment; Court Official: Esqueda, Carlo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Esqueda, Carlo; Additional Text: Money

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Additional Text: RD 2-10-23 judgment for plntf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: $60

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 001892, Payable Number: 588559, Receipt Number: 23RS002135, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less