This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 08/15/2022 at 12:39:00 (UTC).

PCA Acquisitions V, LLC vs. Thomas A Hidde

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 PCA Acquisitions V, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Thomas A Hidde. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A, Christensen, Samuel A and Fredrickson, Jon E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1509

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gasiorkiewicz, Eugene A

Christensen, Samuel A

Fredrickson, Jon E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PCA Acquisitions V, LLC

3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa

Defendant

Hidde, Thomas A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 419706, Payable Number: 460727, Receipt Number: 22R 006894F, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: RACINE; Case number: 2022SC001509; Caption: PCA Acquisitions V, LLC vs. Thomas A Hidde; Total Amount: $2204.56; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: PCA Acquisitions V, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Thomas A Hidde; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3609 10TH AVE, Racine, WI 53402-3203 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1880.06; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $60.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A; Additional Text: Defendant Thomas A Hidde not in court. Attorney Samuel J Olson appeared by video for PCA Acquisitions V, LLC. Judgment plus CC granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Christensen, Samuel A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Fredrickson, Jon E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on July 14, 2022 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $1880.06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 410608, Payable Number: 458500, Receipt Number: 22R 005828F, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J