This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 09/17/2022 at 18:12:41 (UTC).

Park Bank vs. D&K Investments of Sparta, LLC dba Silent Outdoors et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 Park Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against D K Investments of Sparta, LLC dba Silent Outdoors. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Trempealeau, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Ziegler, Todd L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0145

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Ziegler, Todd L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Park Bank

700 State Street

Defendants

D&K Investments of Sparta, LLC dba Silent Outdoors

2700 Riley Road

Siekert, Timothy

Leis, Steven

City of Sparta, as SII of Sparta Industrial Park Corp

112 S. Court Street, Suite 103

WI Department of Revenue

Po Box 8906

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Addis, Phillip James

Defendant Attorney

Ben-Zikri, Adam Y.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Certificate of Service - City of Sparta

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Certificate of Service - D&K Investments of Sparta dba Silent Outdoors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Certificate of Service - Timothy Siekert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: Certificate of Service - Steven Leis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Admission of service; Additional Text: Admission of Service by WI Dept of Revenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Notice of Appearance and Claim to Surplus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 005462, Payable Number: 173295, Receipt Number: 22RT002387, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Verification Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Tim Siekert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Steven Leis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ben-Zikri, Adam Y.