This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 01/31/2023 at 12:58:56 (UTC).

OPPORTUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC vs. CLAYTON DAVIS

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 OPPORTUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CLAYTON DAVIS. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Raihle, David, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0704

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Raihle, David, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPPORTUNITY FINANCIAL, LLC

C/O Markoff Law Llc, 29 N. Wacker Dr. #1010

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant

DAVIS, CLAYTON

Bloomer, WI 54724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

King, Madeleine

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letter of dismissal; Additional Text: filed by Markoff Law LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: to defendant, Clayton Davis returned by USPS marked "Return to Sender; Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward" - Summons & Complaint and Electronic Filing Notice. NOTE: Plaintiff to notify clerk how to proceed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: Plaintiff notified to file Chippewa County Small Claims Rules to be mailed with Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 181402, Payable Number: 167671, Receipt Number: 22R 017737, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer King, Madeleine