This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 08/02/2022 at 18:02:57 (UTC).

One Community Bank vs. Estate of Kathryn R. Fleming et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 One Community Bank filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Estate of Kathryn R Fleming. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Trammell, Nia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1338

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Trammell, Nia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

One Community Bank

733 Main Street

McFarland State Bank

733 Main Street

Defendants

Estate of Kathryn R. Fleming

C/O James D. Fleming Personal Representative, 623 Summit Road

Fleming, Kathryn

Wisconsin Department of Revenue

Special Procedures Unit - 2135 Rimrock Road, P.O. Box 8901

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bosshard, Andrew R.

Defendant Attorney

McNeilly, James W., Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons and Complaint; served on DE Estate of Kathryn R. Fleming on 06/13/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Electronic Filing Notice, Summons and Complaint; served on DE WI Department of Revenue on 06/10/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Atty James W. McNeilly, Jr. on behalf of DE WI Dept. of Revenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certified copy of lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 028263, Payable Number: 565522, Receipt Number: 22RS024426, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNeilly, James W., Jr.