This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 06/01/2022 at 23:10:28 (UTC).

MTZ Rentals LLC vs. Debra Kercher

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 MTZ Rentals LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Debra Kercher. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kreuser, Jacalyn A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0422

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MTZ Rentals LLC

808 N Maple Ave

Marshfield, WI 54449

MTX Rentals LLC

808 N Maple Ave

Marshfield, WI 54449

Defendant

Kercher, Debra

Marshfield, WI 54449

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eviction hearing; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Location: Wood County Circuit Court; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Amount: $75.0; Additional Text: Debra Kercher; S&C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Acknowledgment from Supreme Court; Additional Text: Mailed on 05/25/22; Posted on 05/24/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 22R 004680

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 31001 (Sm Claim, Claim Under $ Limit) to 31004 (Small Claims, Eviction).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: 606 W Arnold St, Marshfield 54449

    Read MoreRead Less