This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 13:07:51 (UTC).

MTGLQ Investors, LP vs. Linda M. Jokinen et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2022 MTGLQ Investors, LP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Linda M Jokinen. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is McKnight, Kelly J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0026

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

McKnight, Kelly J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MTGLQ Investors, LP

275 West Natick Road, Suite 500

Warwick, RI 02886

Defendants

Jokinen, Linda M.

High Bridge, WI 54846

Jokinen, John A.

High Bridge, WI 54846

Occupants, Unknown

High Bridge, WI 54846

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schmeling, Sara Marie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Adjourned return date; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Location: Ashland County Courthouse - Room 303; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Court Reporter: Lundmark, Staci; Additional Text: 08:00 AM Attorney Sara Marie Schmeling not in court. Defendant John A. Jokinen not in court. Defendant Linda M. Jokinen not in court. Defendant Unknown Occupants not in court. No appearances, Ct comments, ltr filed to adjourn - 2nd time to achieve serv. Ct adjourns to May 18, 2022 @ 8:00 am. If serv isn't achieved, will be dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on May 18, 2022 at 08:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: to Clerk from Plntff Atty re: request adjourn hearing on April 6, 2022 @ 8:00 am to properly effectuate service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to: judge from: pralegal Brandon Lachance Re: request to adj

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Mar. 2, 2022 at 8:00 am. Eviction due to Foreclosure. Personal Service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 008853, Payable Number: 80788, Receipt Number: 22R 000707, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Linda M Jokinen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Affidavit in Support of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: John A Jokinen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: McKnight, Kelly J; Additional Text: Unknown Occupants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schmeling, Sara Marie