This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 06/30/2022 at 22:55:26 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management, Inc vs. Rhondaann Aumann

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 Midland Credit Management, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rhondaann Aumann. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Meyer, Stephen D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1171

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Meyer, Stephen D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Credit Management, Inc

350 Camino De La Reina, Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendants

Aumann, Rhondaann

Milton, WI 53563-1000

Wagner, Rhondaann

Milton, WI 53563-1000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hermersmann, Jason Donald

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Location: Video Conference: Zoom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on July 13, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Additional Text: Clerk of Court mail service. Summons and Complaint with eFiling Notice and Notice of hearing mailed to Defendant(s): Rhondaann Aumann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Claim for Money $1,513.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 519071, Payable Number: 269345, Receipt Number: 22R 019950, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Defendant: Rhondaann Aumann AKA Rhondaann Wagner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hermersmann, Jason Donald