This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/31/2023 at 18:12:04 (UTC).

Mary Rebello et al vs. Kunes Country C of Barneveld, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Mary Rebello filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Kunes Country C of Barneveld, Inc. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0214

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rebello, Mary

Skattum, Kyle

Defendant

Kunes Country C of Barneveld, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deladurantey, Nathan Edward

Hudock, Luke

Defendant Attorney

Horner, Sarah J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003401, Payable Number: 118427, Receipt Number: 22R 005663, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Additional Text: to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003226, Payable Number: 118255, Receipt Number: 22R 005378, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less