This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 22:37:52 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Toran Nolden

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Toran Nolden. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is SCC3. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1069

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

SCC3

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Nolden, Toran

Milwaukee, WI 53218-5510

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: SCC3; Location: ZOOM HEARING - SMALL CLAIMS; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 1, 2023 at 09:30 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Small Claims; Amount: $635.31; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 004288, Payable Number: 1056634, Receipt Number: 23RP002032, Amount: $118.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less