This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 11/15/2022 at 12:44:22 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Theresa Ruegg

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Theresa Ruegg. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Doyle, Gloria L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1063

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Doyle, Gloria L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Ruegg, Theresa

Baraboo, WI 53913

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service for Ruegg, Theresa; Additional Text: Notice of Judgement and Financial Disclosure. Forwarding Address: 1717 Crawford St, Baraboo, WI 53913

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Ruegg, Theresa; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Theresa Ruegg Current: 1717 Crawford Street, Baraboo, WI 53913 United States (Effective: 10-24-2022) Prior: 640 ANGEL CT, Holmen, WI 54636-9498 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 007915, Payable Number: 196678, Receipt Number: 22R 013870, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2022SC001063; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Theresa Ruegg; Total Amount: $843.67; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Theresa Ruegg; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1717 Crawford Street, Baraboo, WI 53913; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $672.17; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.; Additional Text: 12:10 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006983, Payable Number: 195821, Receipt Number: 22R 012413, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J