This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 11/15/2022 at 12:39:26 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Steven Schultz

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven Schultz. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herring, David and Paz, Monica. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2592

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herring, David

Paz, Monica

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Schultz, Steven

Butler, WI 53007-1638

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 039289, Payable Number: 477301, Receipt Number: 22R 043218, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WAUKESHA; Case number: 2022SC002592; Caption: LVNV Funding LLC vs. Steven Schultz; Total Amount: $3225.43; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV Funding LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Steven Schultz; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 12765 W Hampton Ave Apt 115, Butler, WI 53007-1638 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2875.93; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $85.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Herring, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Paz, Monica

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Herring, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Herring, David; Additional Text: 2:14 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Service made of Authenticated Summons and Complaint; Electronic Filing Notice on Steven Schultz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Herring, David

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 035705, Payable Number: 474908, Receipt Number: 22R 038943, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: as to Steven Schultz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Plaintiffs proposed exhibit Credit One Bank credit card statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims Information sheet to be attached to all copies of Summons and Complaint for service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Small Claims And Eviction Exhibit Process Information Sheet, to be attached to all small claims forms for service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Amount on complaint:$ 2,875.93 Declaration of nonmilitary service as to: Steven Schultz Service as to: Steven Schultz All Cost of Service and/or Publication: $85.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J