This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 08/25/2022 at 22:36:40 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Octavia Hassel

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Octavia Hassel. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is SCC1. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0770

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

SCC1

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Defendant

Hassel, Octavia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: SCC1; Location: Courthouse, Room 400; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on September 2, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $943.31; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 077325, Payable Number: 1025490, Receipt Number: 22RP032310, Amount: $118.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J