This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 12:32:12 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Mauricio Juarez

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mauricio Juarez. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9420

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Defendant

Juarez, Mauricio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court; Additional Text: This hearing was held via Zoom due to COVID-19. Attorney James Kachelski appeared by video for LVNV Funding LLC. Defendant Mauricio Juarez not in court. Default Judgment granted to Plaintiff in the amount of $1,159.06 plus costs with immediate entry of Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on August 26, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $1159.06; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 070522, Payable Number: 1022213, Receipt Number: 22RP030129, Amount: $118.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Credit Card Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J