This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2023 at 13:27:25 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Lori Salis

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lori Salis. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, Matthew C and Achterberg Welch, Michelle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0249

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, Matthew C

Achterberg Welch, Michelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Salis, Lori

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/06/2023

HearingDescription: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Location: Iowa County Courthouse; Type: Court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 1:10 PM Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC not in court. Attorney Samuel J Olson not in court. Defendant Lori Salis not in court. Court does not have proof of service. Adjourned for service. Adjourned return date scheduled for February 6, 2023 at 01:00 pm.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by certified mail; Court Official: Achterberg Welch, Michelle; Additional Text: CM7020 2450 0001 3498 7459

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $122.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003222, Payable Number: 118247, Receipt Number: 22R 005369, Amount: $122.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2022

DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less