This case was last updated from Outagamie County Courts on 03/14/2023 at 12:45:55 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. JASON GARVIN

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON GARVIN. This case was filed in Outagamie County Courts, Outagamie County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Budiac, Maureen Roberts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0183

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Outagamie, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Budiac, Maureen Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

GARVIN, JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kellum, Daniel E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 084364, Payable Number: 430789, Receipt Number: 23R 004871, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts; Additional Text: Amended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: OUTAGAMIE; Case number: 2023SC000183; Caption: LVNV FUNDING LLC vs. JASON GARVIN; Total Amount: $1419.42; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Judgment amended from $2,316.50 to $1414.42 to reflect correct judgment and costs amount.; Judgment Party; Party Name: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 6801 S CIMARRON RD, SUITE 424-J, LAS VEGAS, NV 89113 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: JASON GARVIN; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 819 E HANCOCK ST, Appleton, WI 54911 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1147.92; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2023-02-07; Type: Amended judgment; Amount: $1414.42

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Default Judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts; Additional Text: Attorney Jason Hermersmann appeared by phone for Plaintiff. Defendant not in Court. Court grants default judgment in favor of Plaintiff. ////Original scanned document deleted due to poor quality. Document re-scanned. ////

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: MONEY $1,147.92

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 23A 041651, Payable Number: 429018, Receipt Number: 23R 001484, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to parties regarding their appearances at Return Date - attachment to Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less