This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2023 at 13:27:16 (UTC).

LVNV Funding LLC vs. Charles Jackson

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 LVNV Funding LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Charles Jackson. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Washington, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0251

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV Funding LLC

Defendant

Jackson, Charles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Location: Iowa County Courthouse; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 1:10 pm Plaintiff LVNV Funding LLC not in court. Attorney Samuel J Olson not in court. Defendant Charles Jackson not in court. No proof of service. Adjourned for service. Adjourned return date scheduled for February 6, 2023 at 01:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by certified mail; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Additional Text: CM#7020 3160 0000 4644 8045

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $122.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003224, Payable Number: 118250, Receipt Number: 22R 005372, Amount: $122.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less