This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 09/12/2022 at 18:10:17 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC vs. TERRY L. FOULK et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against TERRY L FOULK. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Cross, Troy D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0191

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Cross, Troy D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

5151 Corporate Drive

Defendants

FOULK, TERRY L.

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERRY L. FOULK

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

10Th St. & Constitution Avenue, 517 E. Wisconsin Avenue

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

1111 Constitution Avenue, Nw, 222 West Washington Avenue

WISCONSIN DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

2135 Rimrock Road, P.O. Box 7857 Madison

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cummings, Shannon Kathleen

Paine, Monica Jean

Defendant Attorneys

McNeilly, James W., Jr.

Ben-Zikri, Adam Y.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Filed by Attorney Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of mailing; Additional Text: 09/07/22 Terry Foulk, Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, Internal Revenue Service, and Wisconsin Department of Revenue mailed Notice of Motion for Default Judgment, Motion for Default Judgment, Declaration of Default, Affidavit of Non-Military Service, and Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Judgment and Statement of Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover Page for filings Filed by Monica Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Declaration of Default Filed by Attorney Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment; Additional Text: Filed Attorney Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion for default judgment; Additional Text: Filed by Attorney Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: and Appearance Johnson, Blumberg & Associates, LLC appears on behalf of Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC Filed by Attorney Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion; Additional Text: for Default Judgment Filed by Attorney Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Invoice/Statement; Additional Text: Proposed Statement of Indebtedness Filed by Attorney Paine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Invoice/Statement; Additional Text: of Indebtedness

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: 08/01/22 Secretary of Housing and Urban Development mailed copy of Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: 08/01/22 Authorized Agent Georgia Kindstorm served Summons and Complaint for Wisconsin Department of Revenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: From Terry Foulk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Adam Ben-Zikri appears on behalf of the State of Wisconsin Department of Revenue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens; Additional Text: Filed by Attorney Cummings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Filed by Plaintiff Attorney Shannon Cummings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 006404, Payable Number: 170411, Receipt Number: 22R 010202, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Proposed exhibit A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ben-Zikri, Adam Y.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNeilly, James W., Jr.