This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 09:12:13 (UTC).

KAO Capital Partners LLC vs. Cliff Neal et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 KAO Capital Partners LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Cliff Neal. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Koehler, Margaret M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0146

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Koehler, Margaret M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KAO Capital Partners LLC

Defendants

Neal, Cliff

Neal, Shanna

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 001772, Payable Number: 116777, Receipt Number: 22R 003164, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.; Additional Text: 5 Day Notice to Pay Rent or Vacate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service by return receipt; Court Official: Koehler, Margaret M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less