This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 01/30/2023 at 21:37:49 (UTC).

John W. Egan vs. Callan T. Backstrom

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 John W Egan filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Callan T Backstrom. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, Matthew C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0165

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, Matthew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Egan, John W.

Chicago, IL 60603

Defendant

Backstrom, Callan T.

Mineral Point, WI 53565

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keyes, Dean J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002355, Payable Number: 117466, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: IOWA; Case number: 2022SC000165; Caption: John W. Egan vs. Callan T. Backstrom; Total Amount: $2292.0; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: John W. Egan; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 8 S. Michigan Ave., Room 2319, Chicago, IL 60603 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Callan T. Backstrom; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 206 High Street, #4, Mineral Point, WI 53565 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1800.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $72.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $300.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 3:15 PM Attorney Dean J. Keyes in court for John W. Egan. Defendant Callan T. Backstrom in court. Gary Tibbitts sworn and testified. Ex. 1-photos. Ex. 2-Notice. 3:25 am Cross. Callan Backstrom sworn and testified. 3:34 pm Cross. 3:35 pm testimony continues. Mr. Backstrom would like refund of rent. 3:44 pm Final arguments. 3:53 pm Findings. Court grants eviction as requested. $1800.00 judgment amount plus costs. Ex. 1 and 2 accepted as offered. Police officer needs to be present when Mr. Backstrom surrenders keys and collects belongs or us of 3rd party drop off. Case adjourned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on September 12, 2022 at 03:15 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.; Court Reporter: Anderson, Stephanie; Additional Text: 1:00 PM Defendant Callan T. Backstrom in court. Attorney Dean J. Keyes in court for John W. Egan. Defendant disputes claim. CT. set for 9/14/22 at 10:00 am. Parties to exchange any written documentation that will be used in the trial by Sept. 5, 2022. Court trial scheduled for September 14, 2022 at 01:00 pm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 002034, Payable Number: 117086, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Judicial transfer; Court Official: Allen, Matthew C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less