This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 01/11/2023 at 08:40:36 (UTC).

Jenny L. Theys et al vs. Progressive Universal Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 Jenny L Theys filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Universal Insurance Company. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hammer, Marc A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0526

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hammer, Marc A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Theys, Jenny L.

Seymour, WI 54165

Theys, Joseph

Seymour, WI 54165

Defendants

Progressive Universal Insurance Company

6300 Wilson Mills Road, W33

Cleveland, OH 44143

Freeman, Jessica P.

Shiocton, WI 54170

Not Yet Classified

Rural Mutual Insurance Company

1241 John Q Hammons Drive, Suite 200

Madison, WI 53717

UnitedHealthCare of Wisconsin, Inc.

125 South 84Th Street, Suite 400

Milwaukee, WI 53214

Wisconsin Department of Health Services

1 West Wilson Street, Room 651

Madison, WI 53707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Janssen, Robert John

Defendant Attorneys

Calkins, Thomas Tyson

Hagen, Kristin M.

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Budzinski, Mark Thomas

Andrews, Mark W

Anderson, Brian D

Mayer, Matthew Shawn

Other Attorneys

Welch, Allison M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Hammer, Marc A.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 2nd Floor, Room 200; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Hammer, Marc A.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 2nd Floor, Room 200; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Hammer, Marc A.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 2nd Floor, Room 200; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Hammer, Marc A.; Location: Brown County Courthouse, 2nd Floor, Room 200; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: and Retainer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketEvent: Substitution of attorney; Additional Text: Attorney Mark Budzinski for Attorney Mark Andrews of Rural Mutual Ins Co

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Expert witness list - plaintiff; Additional Text: Plaintiffs' Disclosure of Expert Witnesses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: Defs' Jury Demand - 6 person

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $36.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 024345, Payable Number: 358950, Receipt Number: 22R 033381, Amount: $36.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: of the State of WI Dept of Health Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order to Name The State of WI, Dept of Health Services as an Involuntary Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Jessica Freeman on 5/22/22 (Efiling Notice, Summons, Complaint, Written Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Progressive Universal Ins Co on 5/11/22 by leaving with Steve Karis, Customer Service Rep (Efiling Notice, Summons, Complaint, Written Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Rural Mutual Ins Co on 5/11/22 by leaving witih Bridget Murry, Legal Asst (Efiling Notice, Summons, Complaint, Written Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: State of WI Dept of Health Services on 5/11/22 by leaving with Vanessa Kuettel, Attorney (Efiling Notice, Summons, Complaint, Written Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: UnitedHealthCare of Wisconsin on 5/11/22 by leaving with Steve Karis, Customer Service Rep (Efiling Notice, Summons, Complaint, Written Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Hammer, Marc A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 012212, Payable Number: 349348, Receipt Number: 22R 017190, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less