This case was last updated from Milwaukee County Courts on 08/25/2022 at 22:34:00 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC vs. Akeem Osborne et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Akeem Osborne. This case was filed in Milwaukee County Courts, Milwaukee County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is SCC1. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0810

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Milwaukee, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

SCC1

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC

3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa

Defendants

Osborne, Akeem

Tate, Niyah A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Return date; Court Official: SCC1; Location: ZOOM HEARING - SMALL CLAIMS; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on September 7, 2022 at 09:30 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Amount: $9043.83; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $118.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 077430, Payable Number: 1025643, Receipt Number: 22RP032406, Amount: $118.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Court Official: Small Claims Commissioner Court

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J