This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 03/01/2023 at 06:03:48 (UTC).

Jacob A. Moermond-Lytle vs. Grande Cheese Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2022 Jacob A Moermond-Lytle filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Grande Cheese Company. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Outagamie, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Bailey-Rihn, Valerie L and Schlipper, Diane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0594

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Bailey-Rihn, Valerie L

Schlipper, Diane

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Moermond-Lytle, Jacob A.

Columbus, WI 53925

Defendants

Grande Cheese Company

Madison, WI 53717

Sentry Insurance Company

301 S. Bedford Street, Suite 1, C/O Ct Corporation System

Madison, WI 53703

Smith, Bradley A.

Fond Du Lac, WI 54937

Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company

Madison, WI 53703

Not Yet Classified

Quartz Health Benefits Plans Corporation

Sauk City, WI 53583

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Snapp, Breanne Leigh

Defendant Attorneys

Fredericks, James M.

Duffy, Ryan T

Hagen, Kristin M.

Anderson, Jennifer L.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Mundt, Rick J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2024
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Schlipper, Diane; Location: 8th Floor, Courtroom 8C - Branch 3; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2024
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Schlipper, Diane; Location: 8th Floor, Courtroom 8C - Branch 3; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2024
  • HearingDescription: Jury trial; Court Official: Schlipper, Diane; Location: 8th Floor, Courtroom 8C - Branch 3; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2024
  • HearingDescription: Jury selection; Court Official: Schlipper, Diane; Location: 8th Floor, Courtroom 8C - Branch 3; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final pre-trial; Court Official: Schlipper, Diane; Location: 8th Floor, Courtroom 8C - Branch 3; Type: Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - defendant; Additional Text: Artisan and Truckers Casualty Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Witness list - defendant; Additional Text: Subrogated DE Quartz Health Benefit Plans Corp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Amended scheduling order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEvent: Amended; Court Official: Schlipper, Diane; Additional Text: Scheduling Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Judge from Atty Snapp re scheduling order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 011369, Payable Number: 558267, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text: Atty James M Fredericks for Defendants, Grande Cheese Company, Sentry Insurance Company and Bradley A Smith

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Motion for change of venue; Additional Text: to Dodge County filed by Atty Fredericks on behalf of Defendants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Grande Cheese, Sentry Insurance and Smith's Answer to Complaint and Answer to Cross/Surbrogation Claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 010609, Payable Number: 557620, Receipt Number: 22RS012062, Amount: $285.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 010609, Payable Number: 557620, Receipt Number: 22RS012062, Amount: $72.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: 12 Person Jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less