This case was last updated from Iowa County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2023 at 16:28:07 (UTC).

In the Estate of Wilson A. Winkers

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 In the Estate of Wilson A Winkers was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Iowa County Wisconsin Courts, Iowa County Circuit Court located in Iowa, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Basting, Kanndie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0067

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Iowa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Basting, Kanndie

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

Stanek, Gary

Kohout, Diane

Winkers, William

Menke, Jim

Biba, Kevin

Kohout IV, John Eric

Stanek, Nick

Winkers, Bonnie

Decedent

Winkers, Wilson A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

Mckinley, Timothy B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Basting, Kanndie; Additional Text: 10:03 AM Attorney Timothy B. Mckinley appeared by phone for Wilson A. Winkers and Gary Stanek. Attorney McKinley has spoken with the parties and he does not anticipate any appearances today or any objections to the Will. The Will will be admitted to probate and the Statement for Informal Administration and Domiciliary Letters will be signed appointing Gary Stanek.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Additional Text: Signed March 5, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 003220, Payable Number: 118241, Receipt Number: 22R 005361, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Signed March 5, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less