This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 06/16/2022 at 23:52:58 (UTC).

In the Estate of William R Firth

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 In the Estate of William R Firth was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Sheffler, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0157

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Sheffler, Brian

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

Firth, Brian G

Carpentersville, IL 60110

Merwin, Shad A

Wauwatosa, WI 53226

Decedent

Firth, William R

Twin Lakes, WI 53181

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

Merwin, Shad A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: deadline for filing a claim against the estate is 10-07-2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian; Additional Text: to Bryan G Firth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 1 - Bryan G Firth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 296438, Payable Number: 342355, Receipt Number: 22R 014540, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Bryan G Firth with Shad A Merwin as Resident Agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less