This case was last updated from Dane County Courts on 02/25/2023 at 12:52:11 (UTC).

In the Estate of William Joseph Jackson

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 In the Estate of William Joseph Jackson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dane County Courts, Dane County Circuit Court located in Dane, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Esqueda, Carlo and Behrens, Danell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0940

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dane, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Esqueda, Carlo

Behrens, Danell

 

Party Details

Decedent

Jackson, William Joseph

Not Yet Classified

Jackson, Jennifer L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Jackson, Robert J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Behrens, Danell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: re: Notice to Creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Behrens, Danell; Additional Text: deadline for filing a claim against the estate is 4-14-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Behrens, Danell; Additional Text: No Will

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Behrens, Danell; Additional Text: Jennifer L Jackson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 060546, Payable Number: 586846, Receipt Number: 22RS055809, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Jennifer L Jackson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Jennifer L Jackson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less