This case was last updated from Ashland County Courts on 04/24/2022 at 13:00:29 (UTC).

In the Estate of William Andraska

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 In the Estate of William Andraska was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Ashland County Courts, Ashland County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Paitl, Sandra A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0011

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Ashland, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Paitl, Sandra A

 

Party Details

Decedents

Andraska, William

Butternut, WI 54514

Andraska, William Joseph

Butternut, WI 54514

Not Yet Classified

Andraska, Carole

Ashland, WI 54806

Weinberger, Kathleen

Iron River, WI 54847

Teeters, Barbara

Butternut, WI 54514

Andraska, Patrick

Colfax, WI 54730

Cramer, Judith

Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494

Kelnhofer, Mary

Lake Wales, FL 33898

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Richter, Deborah M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Paitl, Sandra A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Paitl, Sandra A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Additional Text: no Will, Dom Letrs, bond not addressed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Carole Andraska

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Deadline for filing a claim: June 3, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Paitl, Sandra A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 008987, Payable Number: 80852, Receipt Number: 22R 000855, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Mary Kelnhofer, FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Patrick Andraska, Colfax, WI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Judith Cramer, WI Rapdis, WI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Barbara Teeters, Butternut, WI; Kathleen Weinberger, Iron River, WI; and Carole Andraska, Ashland, WI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Carole Andraska, as PR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richter, Deborah M