This case was last updated from Adams County Courts on 04/15/2022 at 13:00:52 (UTC).

In the Estate of Wendy L. Hiller

Case Summary

On 02/14/2022 In the Estate of Wendy L Hiller was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Adams County Courts, Adams County Circuit Court located in Waukesha, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Wood, Daniel G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0015

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Adams, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Wood, Daniel G

 

Party Details

Decedent

Hiller, Wendy L.

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Administrator

Hueneke, Christopher M.

Greenfield, WI 53220

Not Yet Classified

Rocket Mortgage, LLC f/k/a Quicken Loans, LLC

1050 Woodward Ave

Detroit, MI 48226

Hiller, Michael

Friendship, WI 53934

Fisher, Kerry

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Piette, Robert M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to Heirs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of summary procedures deadline; Court Official: Wood, Daniel G.; Court Reporter: Klaus, Kristi; Additional Text: Twelve month closing date on February 15, 2023 at 08:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 013338, Payable Number: 74179, Receipt Number: 22R 000693, Amount: $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Filing Letter from Attorney Piette

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: By Christopher M. Hueneke

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order appointing special administrator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Piette, Robert M