This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 12/30/2022 at 23:52:52 (UTC).

In the Estate of Thomas L Stollberg

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 In the Estate of Thomas L Stollberg was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Coykendall, Sherry and Coykendall, Sherry D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0216

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Coykendall, Sherry

Coykendall, Sherry D

 

Party Details

Decedent

Stollberg, Thomas L

West Bend, WI 53095

Not Yet Classified

Schwartz, Terri A

West Bend, WI 53095

Driebel, Sandra J

Saukville, WI 53080

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2024
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter received from Christopher C Janson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: dated - April 2, 1999

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry; Additional Text: Notice & Bond Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry; Additional Text: Issued to: Sandra J. Driebel and Terri A. Schwartz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry; Additional Text: Deadline to File Claims: 03/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 214597, Payable Number: 172473, Receipt Number: 22R 022630, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Sandra and Terri

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Terri

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Sandra

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less