This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 07/12/2022 at 12:49:58 (UTC).

In the Estate of Terrence R Doyle

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 In the Estate of Terrence R Doyle was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Weber, Jennifer and Hartley, Brian C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0057

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Weber, Jennifer

Hartley, Brian C

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

Doyle, John

Doyle, Noah

Lake Mills, WI 53551

Doyle, Willow

Lake Mills, WI 53551

Summit Credit Union

1709 Landmark Drive

Cottage Grove, WI 53527

Decedent

Doyle, Terrence R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Pyzyk, Roger C.

Monogue, Thomas J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-GAL Atty Monogue on behalf of Noah and Willow Doyle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Domiciliary letters issued to John Doyle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $118800.58; Additional Text: Summit Credit Union

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 139629, Payable Number: 192385, Receipt Number: 22R 010391, Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 117142, Payable Number: 191745, Receipt Number: 22R 008871, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Consent to serve as personal representative-John Doyle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-John Doyle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Proposed Order on Petition to be named as interested person

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pyzyk, Roger C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monogue, Thomas J.